Simmons v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kizzy Simmons
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00508
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of certified mail re: SS Complaint served 10/23/20 as to SSA (cmj)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. USA served on 10/22/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. (cmj)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth P. Stepan on behalf of Andrew Saul (Stepan, Elizabeth)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/19/20. (cmj)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cmj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2020: #1 Tracking Numbers Certified Mail) (cmj).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/16/2020. (bld)
October 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kizzy Simmons. (Blakeney, Walter)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( IFP.), filed by Kizzy Simmons. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Blakeney, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Stepan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kizzy Simmons
Represented By: Walter Allen Blakeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?