Jackson v. Saul
Plaintiff: J.C. Jackson
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00562
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of of green card re: SS Complaint served 12/7/20 as to USAG (cmj)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of green card re: SS Complaint served 12/3/20 as to SSI (cmj)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA served on 12/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2021. (cmj)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth P. Stepan on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Stepan, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul 70191120000220687835, U.S. Attorney 70191120000220687859 and U.S. Attorney General 70191120000220687842. (cmj)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/30/20. (cmj)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Clerk to serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/30/20. (cmj)
November 24, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (mbp)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by J.C. Jackson. (Coplin, William)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by J.C. Jackson. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Coplin, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C. Jackson
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Stepan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?