Pineda v. Marlowe Electric, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Priscilla Pineda
Defendant: James Walters and Marlowe Electric, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00089
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/30/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/16/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Marlowe Electric, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/16/2021. (ajl)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Marlowe Electric, LLC, and Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 filed by James Walters. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant James Walters. (Howard, Rick)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Marlowe Electric, LLC. (Howard, Rick)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Marlowe Electric, LLC, James Walters. (Howard, Rick)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Priscilla Pineda. Marlowe Electric, LLC served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021 (Evans, Daniel)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Priscilla Pineda. James Walters served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021 (Evans, Daniel)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 2/24/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 4/9/2021.. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 2/24/21. (cmj)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Marlowe Electric, LLC, James Walters. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Priscilla Pineda. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 5/24/2021. (Fee $402, Receipt Number 46031055479, Fee Paid at Intake) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Evans, Daniel) Modified on 2/24/2021 (meh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2021: #4 Receipt) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pineda v. Marlowe Electric, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walters
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlowe Electric, LLC
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Pineda
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?