Skipper v. Saul
Plaintiff: Darrell Skipper
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv00276
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 07/05/2021 as to Social Security Administration. (srd)
July 5, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 07/02/2021 as to U.S. Attorney General. (srd)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth P. Stepan on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Stepan, Elizabeth)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew M. Saul served on 6/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (srd)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 06/15/2021. (srd)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. (srd)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order re GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darrell Skipper. Clerk is DIRECTED to serve summons and the complaint as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 06/15/2021. (srd) Copy to parties. (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2021: #1 Cert Mail Receipts) (srd).
June 15, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (srd)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darrell Skipper. (Coplin, William)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Darrell Skipper. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 9/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Coplin, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2021: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skipper v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Stepan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Skipper
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?