Butler v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Mickie Butler
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 2:2021cv00350
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2022 at 3:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Bench Trial set during the month of August 2022. Discovery cutoff 2/11/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2021. Motions due by 2/25/2022. Position Regarding Settlement due by 2/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/06/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (srd) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Copy to Plaintiff.
October 5, 2021 REFERRAL OF #7 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge to Judge Beaverstock. (srd)
October 5, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2021. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srd)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.. (Pearce, Julie)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: #5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, ( Scheduling Conference set, by telephone, for 10/5/2021 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/27/2021. (eec)
September 27, 2021 Remark: Notice of Electronic Filing mailed to Plaintiff (eec)
September 27, 2021 REFERRAL OF #5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Murray. (cmj)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Pearce, Julie)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Mickie Butler "tell me we your address is and the phone number and what day I got courts". Clerk re-mailed PSO with note stating court date has not yet been set and including main phone number. (cmj)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/24/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/10/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2851904, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Pearce, Julie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2021: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Pearce, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Julie D. Pearce
Represented By: Michael Jason Marable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?