The Town of Pine Hill, Alabama v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: The Town of Pine Hill, Alabama
Defendant: Shannon Dixon, Steve Webb, Solenis LLC, Dupont De Nemours, Inc., 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., BASF Corporation, EIDP, Inc., Corteva, Inc., International Paper Company, The Chemours Company, Carla Pearson and E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00284
Filed: August 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #64 MOTION to Stay re #18 MOTION to Remand & Supporting Brief. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (meh)
October 10, 2024 Filing 64 MOTION to Stay re #18 MOTION to Remand & Supporting Brief 3M Company's Motion to Stay Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Decision Whether to Transfer This Case to the In RE AFFL MDL filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Transfer) (Radney, William)
October 9, 2024 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla R. Williams on behalf of 3M Company (Williams, Kayla)
September 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #59 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 26(f) Conference and Report Deadline. The parties must now meet and file a report pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) in accordance with the Preliminary Scheduling Order #7 no later than 1/31/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/30/2024. (ctn)
September 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #32 Disclosure Statement filed by International Paper Company; #20 & #35 Disclosure Statements filed by Solenis LLC; #2 & #36 Disclosure Statements filed by 3M Company; #40 Disclosure Statement filed by Corteva, Inc.; #39 Disclosure Statement filed by EIDP, Inc.; #41 Disclosure Statement filed by Dupont De Nemours, Inc.; and #42 Disclosure Statement filed by The Chemours Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/30/2024. (ctn)
September 30, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #59 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 26(f) Conference and Report Deadline - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
September 29, 2024 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Nicole Thompson on behalf of 3M Company (Thompson, Amber)
September 29, 2024 Filing 59 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 26(f) Conference and Report Deadline filed by 3M Company. (Gilchrist, Wesley)
September 17, 2024 Filing 58 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff The Town of Pine Hill, Alabama re: #53 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by The Town of Pine Hill, Alabama. (Griffith, Matthew)
September 17, 2024 REFERRAL OF #58 Reply Brief to Judge Nelson. (meh)
September 13, 2024 REFERRAL OF #53 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Nelson. (meh)
September 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ENDORSED ORDER granting #56 Defendant Solenis LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Solenis shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 12/20/2024. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 09/12/2024. (khc)
September 11, 2024 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Solenis LLC. (Davis, Richard)
September 11, 2024 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Upchurch on behalf of Daikin America, Inc. (Upchurch, Michael)
September 10, 2024 Filing 54 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #27 filed by Daikin America, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #40 filed by Corteva, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #39 filed by EIDP, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #41 filed by Dupont De Nemours, Inc., and Corporate Disclosure Statement #42 filed by The Chemours Company. Review of the corporate disclosure statements has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
September 10, 2024 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand & Supporting Brief Defendant 3M Company's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by 3M Company. (Radney, William)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #48 Defendants 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., International Paper Company, Shannon Dixon, Carla Pearson, and Steve Webb's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint: re #48 . Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before December 20, 2024. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/10/2024. (khc)
September 10, 2024 Filing 51 Documents endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #32 filed by International Paper Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement #36 filed by 3M Company, and Corporate Disclosure Statement #35 filed by Solenis LLC. Review of the corporate disclosure statements has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ENDORSED ORDER granting #49 MOTION and APPLICATION for Shelby Riney to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Solenis LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/9/2024. (ctn)
September 6, 2024 Filing 49 MOTION and APPLICATION for Shelby Riney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 100, Receipt number AALSDC-3454871, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Solenis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Riney, Shelby)
September 6, 2024 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., Shannon Dixon, International Paper Company, Carla Pearson, Steve Webb. (Flachsbart, Elizabeth)
September 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #45 MOTION and APPLICATION for Jillian Flax to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Solenis LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/6/2024. (ctn)
September 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #34 MOTION and APPLICATION for James Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Solenis LLC, as amended #44 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/6/2024. (ctn)
September 6, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #49 MOTION and APPLICATION for Shelby Riney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (meh)
September 6, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
September 3, 2024 Filing 45 MOTION and APPLICATION for Jillian Flax to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 100, Receipt number AALSDC-3452942, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Solenis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Flax, Jillian)
September 3, 2024 Filing 44 AMENDED #34 MOTION and APPLICATION for James Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. Gen filed by Solenis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Heller, James)
September 3, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #45 MOTION and APPLICATION for Jillian Flax to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (meh)
September 3, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #44 AMENDED MOTION and APPLICATION for to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (meh)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #33 MOTION and APPLICATION for James R. Saywell to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daikin America, Inc., as supplemented #38 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/30/2024. (ctn)
August 29, 2024 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Harrison, Mary)
August 29, 2024 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Dupont De Nemours, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Harrison, Mary)
August 29, 2024 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Corteva, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Harrison, Mary)
August 29, 2024 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant EIDP, Inc.. (Harrison, Mary)
August 29, 2024 Filing 38 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Certificate of Good Standing by Daikin America, Inc. re: #33 MOTION and APPLICATION for James R. Saywell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. (Saywell, James)
August 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #34 MOTION and APPLICATION for James Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Solenis LLC. Heller is ORDERED to amend his application to provide affirmative answers to questions 4(a) and 6 no later than 9/6/2024. Failure to comply may result in denial of the application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/29/2024. (ctn)
August 29, 2024 REFERRAL OF #38 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Judge Nelson. (meh)
August 29, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #33 MOTION and APPLICATION for James R. Saywell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (meh)
August 28, 2024 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Radney, William)
August 28, 2024 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Solenis LLC, Solenis Holdings 1, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Solenis Holdings 1, LLC for Solenis LLC.. (Davis, Richard)
August 28, 2024 Filing 34 MOTION and APPLICATION for James Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 100, Receipt number AALSDC-3450389, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Solenis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Heller, James)
August 28, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #34 MOTION and APPLICATION for James Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (meh)
August 26, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION and APPLICATION for James R. Saywell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 100, Receipt number AALSDC-3448975, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Daikin America, Inc.. (Flachsbart, Elizabeth)
August 26, 2024 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants International Paper Company, T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Branigar Organization, Inc., The, Carton y Papel Reciclado, S.A., Cartonajes International, S.L., Cartonajes Union S.L., Certified Forest Management LLC, CircleTree Insurance Company, CMCP - INTERNATIONAL PAPER S.A.S., Commercial Realty & Properties LLC, EM Xpedx, S.A. De C.V., English Oak LLC, Federal Forestlands Inc., I.P. CONTAINER HOLDINGS (SPAIN) S.L., International Paper (Asia) Limited, International Paper (Europe) S. r.l., International Paper (New Zealand) Limited, International Paper Asia Limited (Branch Office), International Paper Canada Pulp Holdings ULC, International Paper Cartones Ltda., International Paper Cellulose Fibers Sales Srl, International Paper Company [Delaware], International Paper Company Employee Relief Fund, International Paper Company Foundation, International Paper Distribution (Shanghai) Limited, INTERNATIONAL PAPER DUTCH SERVICES B.V., International Paper Export Sales, Inc., International Paper Financial Services, Inc., International Paper France SAS, International Paper Global Cellulose Fibers Holdings S. r.l., International Paper Holdings (Luxembourg) S. r.l., International Paper Investment (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., International Paper Investment (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Branch, Basswood Forests LLC, International Paper (India) LLP, International Paper Cabourg SAS, International Paper Cartovar, S.A., International Paper Cellulose Fibers (Poland) sp. z o.o., International Paper Chalon SAS, International Paper CTA (Mexico), S. de R.L. de C.V., International Paper Espaly SAS, International Paper Investments (Luxembourg) S. r.l., International Paper Italia Srl, International Paper Japan Limited, International Paper Madrid Mill, S.L., International Paper Manufacturing & Distribution Limited, International Paper Mexico Company, S. de R.L. de C.V., International Paper Molded Fiber LLC, International Paper Mortagne SAS, International Paper Peru S.R.L., International Paper Polska Sp. z o.o., International Paper Professional Services Corporation, International Paper Russia Holding B.V., International Paper Saint-Amand, International Paper Switzerland GmbH, INTERNATIONAL PAPER UK HOLDINGS LIMITED, IP Acquisition I, LLC, IP Belgian Services Company SRL, IP Canada Holdings Limited, IP CBPR Properties 2 LLC, IP CBPR Properties LLC, IP Commercial Properties LLC, IP Eagle LLC, IP East Holding (Singapore) Pte. Ltd., IP Forest Resources Company, Inc., IP International Holdings, Inc., IP Mexico Holdings S. r.l., IP Petroleum LLC, IP Realty Holdings LLC, IP Singapore Holding Pte. Ltd., IP Timberlands Operating Company, Ltd., IP-35, Inc., Lacebark LLC, Lake Superior Land Company, Longleaf Insurance Company, Lost Creek, Inc., Med Packaging SARL, Northwest Pines, Inc., Peninsular Cogeneracin, S.A., Red Bird Receivables, LLC, Sabine River & Northern Railroad Company, Societe Mediterraneenne d'Emballages SAS, SP Forests L.L.C., Supplier Finance Company, LLC, Sustainable Forests L.L.C., Temple Associates LLC, Timberlands Capital Corp. II, Inc., Timberlands Capital Corp. III, Inc., TIN Land Financing, LLC, TIN Timber Financing, LLC, U. C. Realty LLC identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Basswood Forests LLC, Other Affiliate Branigar Organization, Inc., The, Other Affiliate Carton y Papel Reciclado, S.A., Other Affiliate Cartonajes International, S.L., Other Affiliate Cartonajes Union S.L., Other Affiliate Certified Forest Management LLC, Other Affiliate CircleTree Insurance Company, Other Affiliate CMCP - INTERNATIONAL PAPER S.A.S., Other Affiliate Commercial Realty & Properties LLC, Other Affiliate EM Xpedx, S.A. De C.V., Other Affiliate English Oak LLC, Other Affiliate Federal Forestlands Inc., Other Affiliate I.P. CONTAINER HOLDINGS (SPAIN) S.L., Other Affiliate International Paper (Asia) Limited, Other Affiliate International Paper (Europe) S. r.l., Other Affiliate International Paper (New Zealand) Limited, Other Affiliate International Paper Asia Limited (Branch Office), Other Affiliate International Paper Canada Pulp Holdings ULC, Other Affiliate International Paper Cartones Ltda., Other Affiliate International Paper Cellulose Fibers Sales Srl, Other Affiliate International Paper Company [Delaware], Other Affiliate International Paper Company Employee Relief Fund, Other Affiliate International Paper Company Foundation, Other Affiliate International Paper Distribution (Shanghai) Limited, Other Affiliate INTERNATIONAL PAPER DUTCH SERVICES B.V., Other Affiliate International Paper Export Sales, Inc., Other Affiliate International Paper Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate International Paper France SAS, Other Affiliate International Paper Global Cellulose Fibers Holdings S. r.l., Other Affiliate International Paper Holdings (Luxembourg) S. r.l., Other Affiliate International Paper Investment (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate International Paper Investment (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Branch, Other Affiliate International Paper (India) LLP, Other Affiliate International Paper Cabourg SAS, Other Affiliate International Paper Cartovar, S.A., Other Affiliate International Paper Cellulose Fibers (Poland) sp. z o.o., Other Affiliate International Paper Chalon SAS, Other Affiliate International Paper CTA (Mexico), S. de R.L. de C.V., Other Affiliate International Paper Espaly SAS, Other Affiliate International Paper Investments (Luxembourg) S. r.l., Other Affiliate International Paper Italia Srl, Other Affiliate International Paper Japan Limited, Other Affiliate International Paper Madrid Mill, S.L., Other Affiliate International Paper Manufacturing & Distribution Limited, Other Affiliate International Paper Mexico Company, S. de R.L. de C.V., Other Affiliate International Paper Molded Fiber LLC, Other Affiliate International Paper Mortagne SAS, Other Affiliate International Paper Peru S.R.L., Other Affiliate International Paper Polska Sp. z o.o., Other Affiliate International Paper Professional Services Corporation, Other Affiliate International Paper Russia Holding B.V., Other Affiliate International Paper Saint-Amand, Other Affiliate International Paper Switzerland GmbH, Other Affiliate INTERNATIONAL PAPER UK HOLDINGS LIMITED, Other Affiliate IP Acquisition I, LLC, Other Affiliate IP Belgian Services Company SRL, Other Affiliate IP Canada Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate IP CBPR Properties 2 LLC, Other Affiliate IP CBPR Properties LLC, Other Affiliate IP Commercial Properties LLC, Other Affiliate IP Eagle LLC, Other Affiliate IP East Holding (Singapore) Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate IP International Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate IP Mexico Holdings S. r.l., Other Affiliate IP Petroleum LLC, Other Affiliate IP Realty Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate IP Singapore Holding Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate IP-35, Inc., Other Affiliate Lacebark LLC, Other Affiliate Lake Superior Land Company, Other Affiliate Longleaf Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lost Creek, Inc., Other Affiliate Med Packaging SARL, Other Affiliate Northwest Pines, Inc., Other Affiliate Peninsular Cogeneracin, S.A., Other Affiliate Red Bird Receivables, LLC, Other Affiliate Sabine River & Northern Railroad Company, Other Affiliate Societe Mediterraneenne d'Emballages SAS, Other Affiliate SP Forests L.L.C., Other Affiliate Supplier Finance Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Sustainable Forests L.L.C., Other Affiliate Temple Associates LLC, Other Affiliate Timberlands Capital Corp. II, Inc., Other Affiliate Timberlands Capital Corp. III, Inc., Other Affiliate TIN Land Financing, LLC, Other Affiliate TIN Timber Financing, LLC, Other Affiliate U. C. Realty LLC, Other Affiliate IP Timberlands Operating Company, Ltd., Other Affiliate IP Forest Resources Company, Inc. for International Paper Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Subsidiaries & Affiliated Companies) (Lankford, Ambria)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Remand & Supporting Brief Stipulation and Unopposed Motion for an Additional 7 Days for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Nonmovants' brief(s) in response to Plaintiff's motion to remand #18 , if any, must now be filed and served no later than 9/10/2024. Movant's brief in reply to the response(s), if any, must now be filed and served no later than 9/17/2024. Motion to now be taken under submission on 9/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/22/2024. (ctn)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #27 Disclosure Statement filed by Daikin America, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/23/2024. (ctn)
August 22, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Burns Johnson on behalf of BASF Corporation (Johnson, Andrew)
August 22, 2024 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Remand & Supporting Brief Stipulation and Unopposed Motion for an Additional 7 Days for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Chemours Company. (Johnson, John)
August 22, 2024 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Daikin America, Inc.. (Yeilding, Christopher)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Dupont De Nemours, Inc., The Chemours Company, EIDP, Inc., and Corteva, Inc. are each ORDERED to file a disclosure statement, using this Court's current form, certifying disclosures required by both Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 no later than 8/29/2024 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/sites/alsd/files/forms/CivilDisclosureStatement.pdf). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/22/2024. (ctn)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #20 Disclosure Statement, filed by Solenis LLC. The statement is deficient for two reasons. First, it fails to cite S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1, and otherwise fails to assure the undersigned that it certifies full disclosure required by that rule. See S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1(b) ("The Disclosure Statement shall identify the represented entity's general nature and shall identify all parents, subsidiaries, partners, members, managers, trustees, affiliates, and similarly related persons and entities."); Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 advisory committees note to 2002 adoption ("Rule 7.1 does not prohibit local rules that require disclosures in addition to those required by Rule 7.1."). Second, it fails to sufficiently provide the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a) because it alleges that its member corporation has "a principal place of business in California" (emphasis added), suggesting more than one. However, for purposes of diversity jurisdiction, a corporation can only have one principal place of business, its "nerve center." See Hertz Corp. v. Friend, 559 U.S. 77 (2010). Solenis LLC is ORDERED to file an amended disclosure statement curing these deficiencies, using this Court's current form, no later than 8/29/2024 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/sites/alsd/files/forms/CivilDisclosureStatement.pdf). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/22/2024. (ctn)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #2 Disclosure Statement filed by 3M Company. The statement cites only Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, and substantially tracks the language of only Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1). This is insufficient because (1) it fails to provide the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) in actions such as this one "in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a)[;]" and (2) because the disclosure requirements of S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 are broader than those of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, see S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1(b) ("The Disclosure Statement shall identify the represented entity's general nature and shall identify all parents, subsidiaries, partners, members, managers, trustees, affiliates, and similarly related persons and entities."); Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 advisory committees note to 2002 adoption ("Rule 7.1 does not prohibit local rules that require disclosures in addition to those required by Rule 7.1."). 3M Company is ORDERED to file an amended disclosure statement curing these deficiencies, using this Court's current form, no later than 8/29/2024 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/sites/alsd/files/forms/CivilDisclosureStatement.pdf). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/22/2024. (ctn)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Motion Deadlines re: #18 MOTION to Remand & Supporting Brief filed by The Town of Pine Hill, Alabama. District Judge referred said motion to Mag. Judge for appropriate action. See S.D. Ala. GenLR 72(b); (8/21/2024 elec. ref. notation). Nonmovants' brief(s) in response to said motion, if any, must be filed and served no later than 9/3/2024. Movant's brief in reply to the response(s), if any, must be filed and served no later than 9/10/2024. See S.D. Ala. GenLR 5(a) and CivLR 7 for briefing technical requirements. Motion to be taken under submission on 9/11/2024. Except as permitted by the Court's Local Rules, e.g., S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(f)(3), no other briefing or submissions addressing the subject motion may be filed without leave of the Court for good cause shown. Should the Court determine that oral argument would be beneficial, a hearing will be set by separate order. Otherwise, the motion is being submitted without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). "Oral argument requests must contain specific reasons why oral argument would be helpful." S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/22/2024. (ctn)
August 22, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Flachsbart on behalf of Daikin America, Inc. (Flachsbart, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen McLean Estes on behalf of Daikin America, Inc. (Estes, Allen)
August 22, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Remand. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (meh)
August 21, 2024 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Solenis LLC, Solenis Holdings 1, LLC, Solenis Holdings, LLC, Olympus Water US Holding Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Solenis Holdings 1, LLC, Corporate Parent Solenis Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Olympus Water US Holding Corp. for Solenis LLC.. (Davis, Richard)
August 21, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Remand & Supporting Brief. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (meh)
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Defendant Solenis LLC's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint; re #17 Answer or response due from Solenis LLC on 9/20/2024. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/20/2024. (khc)
August 20, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand & Supporting Brief filed by The Town of Pine Hill, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E) (Griffith, Matthew)
August 20, 2024 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Solenis LLC. (Davis, Richard)
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Defendants 3M Company and Daikin America, Inc.'s unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint; re #15 Answer or response due from 3M Company on 9/20/2024; Daikin America, Inc. on 9/20/2024. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/20/2024. (khc)
August 20, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
August 20, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
August 19, 2024 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Daikin America, Inc.. (Yeilding, Christopher)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Defendants International Paper Company, Shannon Dixon, Carla Pearson and Steve Webb's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before September 20. 2024. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/19/2024. (khc)
August 19, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Eldon Davis on behalf of Solenis LLC (Davis, Richard)
August 19, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
August 16, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Martin Perry on behalf of Shannon Dixon, International Paper Company, Carla Pearson, Steve Webb (Perry, Kenneth)
August 16, 2024 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Shannon Dixon, International Paper Company, Carla Pearson, Steve Webb. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lankford, Ambria)
August 16, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Traeger, III on behalf of Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Chemours Company (Traeger, William)
August 16, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Johnson on behalf of Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Chemours Company (Johnson, John)
August 16, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Harrison on behalf of Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Chemours Company (Harrison, Mary)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (meh)
August 14, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Corteva, Inc.. (Speegle, Clinton)
August 14, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by EIDP, Inc.. (Speegle, Clinton)
August 14, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Chemours Company. (Speegle, Clinton)
August 14, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dupont De Nemours, Inc.. (Speegle, Clinton)
August 14, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Radney, William)
August 14, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405, Receipt number AALSDC-3443180, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court File, #4 Exhibit C - Consents, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Shannon Dixon, #6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Steve Webb, #7 Exhibit F- Declaration of Kevin Gramelspacher, #8 Exhibit G - Declaration of Carla Pearson) (Radney, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Town of Pine Hill, Alabama v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Dixon
Represented By: William M. Pompey
Represented By: Kenneth Martin Perry
Represented By: Ambria LaFaye Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Webb
Represented By: William M. Pompey
Represented By: Kenneth Martin Perry
Represented By: Ambria LaFaye Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solenis LLC
Represented By: Shelby Riney
Represented By: Jillian Flax
Represented By: James Harris Heller
Represented By: Richard Eldon Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours, Inc.
Represented By: Clinton Timothy Speegle
Represented By: William H. Traeger, III
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Harrison
Represented By: John M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: William Larkin Radney, IV
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: M. Christian King
Represented By: Kayla R. Williams
Represented By: Amber Nicole Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daikin America, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Lynch Yeilding
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Represented By: Elizabeth Flachsbart
Represented By: Allen McLean Estes
Represented By: James Robert Saywell
Represented By: James Robert Saywell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Burns Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EIDP, Inc.
Represented By: Clinton Timothy Speegle
Represented By: William H. Traeger, III
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Harrison
Represented By: John M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Represented By: Clinton Timothy Speegle
Represented By: William H. Traeger, III
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Harrison
Represented By: John M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: William M. Pompey
Represented By: Kenneth Martin Perry
Represented By: Ambria LaFaye Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: Clinton Timothy Speegle
Represented By: William H. Traeger, III
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Harrison
Represented By: John M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Pearson
Represented By: William M. Pompey
Represented By: Kenneth Martin Perry
Represented By: Ambria LaFaye Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Traeger, III
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Harrison
Represented By: John M. Johnson
Represented By: Clinton Timothy Speegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Town of Pine Hill, Alabama
Represented By: Rhon E. Jones
Represented By: Jere L. Beasley
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Represented By: Gavin Floyd King
Represented By: Elizabeth Weyerman
Represented By: David L. Diab
Represented By: Matthew Ross Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?