Woods v. The State of Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Andre Woods
Defendant: The State of Alabama and Selma City
Case Number: 2:2024cv00467
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Stephen Andre Woods. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiffs failure to prosecute and to comply with the Courts order Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 2/13/2025. Copy mailed to Plaintiff at Dallas County Sheriff's Office. (fz)
December 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Petitioner to refile his 2241 habeas petition. Petitioner must also either pay the $5 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis NLT 1/27/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/26/2024. A copy of this Order, IFP motion form, 2241 petition form, and (Doc. #1 ) mailed to Petitioner at the Dallas County Sheriff's Office. (fz)
December 16, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing entered. Copy mailed to Plaintiff at Dallas County Sheriff's Office. (fz)
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Selma City, The State of Alabama, filed by Stephen Andre Woods. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 3/16/2025. Referred to Judge Murray(PSU). (fz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. The State of Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Andre Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selma City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?