United States of America v. Robinson
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert D. Robinson
Case Number: 1:2018cv00015
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Case Status. Plaintiffs time for effecting service upon defendant is extended to a maximum of 90 days beyond the restoration of DOJ funding. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 1/4/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Re: Service of Complaint by United States of America. (Quinn, Vickey)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file a proof of service by seven days from the entry of this order or file a status report concerning service of the complaint on the defendant. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedures to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 11/27/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2018 Summons Issued as to Robert D. Robinson. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Robert D. Robinson. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/8/2018) (PXS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Robert D. Robinson, filed by United States of America.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Vickey L. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?