Werner v. Holland America Line, Inc.

Plaintiff: Donna Werner
Defendant: Holland America Line, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00018
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Keene, H.)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Holland America Line, Inc..(Keene, H.)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Holland America Line, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix)(Keene, H.)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Holland America Line, Inc. (Keene, H.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Keene, H.)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Holland America Line, Inc. To United States District Court from Juneau Superior Court, case number 1JU-18-902CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2617791), filed by Holland America Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Keene, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Werner v. Holland America Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line, Inc.
Represented By: H. Clay Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Werner
Represented By: Timothy M. Twomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?