U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Club Demonstration Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Club Demonstration Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00007
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Order re Motion to Dimiss by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission re #4 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service)(Blackman, Amos)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Order re Motion to Dismiss served on Mandee Collins, Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent of Defendant Club Demonstration Services, Inc. on 06/17/2019, filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Blackman, Amos)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT concerning service of the complaint on defendant by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Blackman, Amos)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT concerning service of the complaint on defendant by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Blackman, Amos)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff shall either file a proof of service by June 5, 2019, or file a status report concerning service of the complaint on defendant. (CME, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/21/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Club Demonstration Services, Inc. (KXC, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Club Demonstration Services Inc, (KXC, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KXC, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and jury demand against Club Demonstration Services, Inc., filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(KXC, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Club Demonstration Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Roberta L. Steele
Represented By: Amos Ben Blackman
Represented By: John Freeman Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Club Demonstration Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?