Laurenzana v. Saul
Plaintiff: Julia Laurenzana
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00012
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Commissioner of the Social Security Administration on 10/4/2019, filed by Julia Laurenzana. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt)(Dellert, Christopher)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due within 60 days of the Defendant's initial appearance. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 10/10/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Andrew Saul (Pomeroy, Richard)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Status Report. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by Julia Laurenzana. (Dellert, Christopher)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file proofs of service by seven days of this order or file a status report concerning service of the complaint on defendants. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 24, 2019 Docket Annotation: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, is substituted for Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to FRCvP 25(d) (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney re Chistopher H. Dellert. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: The Application to Waive the Filing Fee, at docket #3 , is granted. Service of Process is to be completed within 90 days of the Complaint. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 8/30/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher H. Dellert. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2752027.) by Julia Laurenzana. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dellert, Christopher)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The assigned judge hereby recuses. This case is re-assigned by random draw to Hon. H. Russel Holland. The case number henceforth will be 1:19-cv-00012-HRH. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Social Security Administration, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Julia Laurenzana.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Julia Laurenzana.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laurenzana v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Laurenzana
Represented By: Christopher H. Dellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?