Olsen v. National Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Jack Olsen
Defendant: National Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00013
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 10/29/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2021. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 11/7/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Barber, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The parties shall file the requested report within 7 days of the date of this order, or the Court intends to schedule a hearing thereafter for the imposition of sanctions. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/24/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due 02/16/2021. proposed jury instructions due by 3/22/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2021 at 03:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. Trial by Jury set for 3/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Juneau Courtroom before Sharon L. Gleason. Exhibit List due by 3/15/2021. Final Witness List due by 3/8/2021. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/11/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sharon L. Gleason: Status Conference held at 11:31 a.m. to 11:39 a.m. on 10/11/2019. Court and counsel heard re trial by jury scheduling. Trial by Jury set for 3/29/2021 at 08:30 AM (estimated 5 days) in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. Court will issue a new scheduling order and parties to file a revised proposed scheduling order with new deadlines by close of business October 18, 2019. (CME, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/11/2019 to add APPEARANCES: Adam Winner; Brewster H. Jamieson; Sonja L. Reeves, Official Court Reporter. (CME, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Angela Miller re #14 MOTION for Leave to File Late Filing of Plaintiff's Request for Jury Trial by Jack Olsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barber, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Late Filing of Plaintiff's Request for Jury Trial by Jack Olsen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barber, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Re Parties' Planning Meeting by National Indemnity Company re #12 Order, Set Hearings (Jamieson, Brewster)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/11/2019 at 11:30 a.m. in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Sharon L. Gleason. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/3/19. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by National Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Notice of Removal)(Jamieson, Brewster)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by National Indemnity Company (Jamieson, Brewster)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Indemnity Company. (Jamieson, Brewster)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by National Indemnity Company.(Jamieson, Brewster)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Re Initial Scheduling & Planning Conference Report. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 9/10/19. (Attachments: #1 Form)(LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bruce Baylous on behalf of National Indemnity Company (Baylous, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brewster H. Jamieson on behalf of National Indemnity Company (Jamieson, Brewster)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Jamieson, Brewster)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Brewster H. Jamieson re #1 Notice of Removal, by National Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service)(Jamieson, Brewster)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Indemnity Company from Superior Court for the State of Alaska at Juneau, case number 1JU-19-00821CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2756185), filed by National Indemnity Company.(Jamieson, Brewster)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olsen v. National Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Olsen
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Indemnity Company
Represented By: Brewster H. Jamieson
Represented By: Michael Bruce Baylous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?