AESIR, LLC v. Piston & Rudder Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: AESIR, LLC
Defendant: Piston & Rudder Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00001
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel James Park on behalf of Piston & Rudder Service, Inc. (Park, Daniel)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Initial Scheduling & Planning Conference Report. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 3/16/21. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AESIR, LLC. Piston & Rudder Service, Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Barcott, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Piston & Rudder Service, Inc.. (Hamilton, Dustin)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Piston & Rudder Service, Inc..(Hamilton, Dustin)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Piston & Rudder Service, Inc., (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Barcott, Michael)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Piston & Rudder Service, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3008494.), filed by AESIR, LLC.(Barcott, Michael)
January 26, 2021 Summons Issued as to Piston & Rudder Service, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AESIR, LLC v. Piston & Rudder Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AESIR, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Barcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piston & Rudder Service, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel James Park
Represented By: Dustin C. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?