Jackson v. Cordle
Petitioner: Randell Gene Jackson
Respondent: State of Alaska and Bob Cordle
Case Number: 1:2021cv00007
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: James K Singleton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance by Petitioner by Randell Gene Jackson re #4 Order Staying Case,, (Attachments: #1 Alaska Supreme Court Petition and Motion Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING STAY: Petitioner to file a copy of the petition filed in state court with filing date, on or before May 26, 2021. The Clerk of Court is further directed to administratively close this case during the pendency of the stay. This closing order removes the action from the Court's active docket for record-keeping purposes; it does not affect the merits of Jackson's claims. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 4/26/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Randell Gene Jackson. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 5/7/2021. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 4/7/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2254 (Filing fee $5/Receipt #ANC017772.), filed by Randell Gene Jackson. (Attachments: #1 District Court Sentence, #2 Superior Court Notice of Appeal, #3 Superior Court District Appeal Order, #4 Superior Court District Appeal Denied, #5 Sentence on Remand of Appeal, #6 Superior Court PCR Dismissal Order, #7 COA Memorandum on Appeal, #8 AK COA Ruling to Uphold, #9 COA Motion to Reconsider, #10 Remand Order to Custody, #11 Judgment 1:21-cv-00005-JMK)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Cordle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bob Cordle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randell Gene Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?