Beebe v. State of Alaska et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Charles Beebe and Jeremy Beebe
Defendant: Department of Corrections, State of Alaska, Chastity Wilson and Gerad Andrews
Case Number: 1:2021cv00012
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 15 Notice to Counsel re #14 Status Report filed by State of Alaska, Gerad Andrews, Chastity Wilson, Department of Corrections. A review of the document submitted at dkt 14 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 14. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 12, 2021 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by Gerad Andrews, Department of Corrections, State of Alaska, Chastity Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Pace, Andalyn)
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Jeremy Beebe re #7 , #12 , #8 , #6 , PS23, PS12. Service for the NEF of the returned mail will not be redistributed to the addressee. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Response due by 8/13/21 re #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendants to file a notice re case status re 1JU-19-00995CI due by 8/13/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/13/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 12, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Nature of Suit in this case is changed from 440 to 550 to reflect that it is a prisoner civil rights action. This change is administrative in nature only. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Gerad Andrews, Department of Corrections, State of Alaska, Chastity Wilson (Pace, Andalyn)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Gerad Andrews, Department of Corrections, State of Alaska, Chastity Wilson (Pace, Andalyn)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Gerad Andrews, Department of Corrections, State of Alaska, Chastity Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pace, Andalyn)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Chastity Wilson.(Pace, Andalyn)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Gerad Andrews.(Pace, Andalyn)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andalyn Pace on behalf of All Defendants (Pace, Andalyn)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by All Defendants (Pace, Andalyn)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Pace, Andalyn)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gerad Andrews, Chastity Wilson, Department of Corrections, State of Alaska from Juneau Superior Court, case number 1JU-21-00512CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3091294), filed by Gerad Andrews, Chastity Wilson, Department of Corrections, State of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pace, Andalyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beebe v. State of Alaska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: Andalyn Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska
Represented By: Andalyn Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chastity Wilson
Represented By: Andalyn Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerad Andrews
Represented By: Andalyn Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Charles Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?