Madsen et al v. North Slope Borough et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Madsen and Katrina Madsen
Defendant: Forrest Olemaun, Ellen Sovalik, Rosemarie Habeich, North Slope Borough and Deano
Case Number: 2:2019cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #3 Unopposed Motion to Remand. The parties agree that there is no longer a federal question in this action and thus the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. The case is therefore REMANDED to the Superior Court of Alaska Second Judicial District at Utqiagvik. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jessica R. Dillon (Dillon, Jessica)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court or Dismiss Notice of Removal filed by Rosemarie Habeich, North Slope Borough, Forrest Olemaun, Ellen Sovalik. (Dillon, Jessica)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court or Dismiss Notice of Removal by Elizabeth Madsen, Katrina Madsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Sara)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Dillon, Jessica)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Superior Court of Alaska Second Judicial District at Utqiagvik, case number 2BA-18-00252 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2631461), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Pls' Amended Complaint)(Dillon, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madsen et al v. North Slope Borough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest Olemaun
Represented By: Jessica R. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Sovalik
Represented By: Jessica R. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemarie Habeich
Represented By: Jessica R. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Slope Borough
Represented By: Jessica R. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deano
Represented By: Jessica R. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Madsen
Represented By: Sara Lynne Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Madsen
Represented By: Sara Lynne Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?