Matyascik v. Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.

Plaintiff: Jason Matyascik
Defendant: Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00002
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] filed by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.. (Patterson, Rebecca)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)]. Replies due by 7/3/2019. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply)(Monkman, Richard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] filed by Jason Matyascik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Rose, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE to Terminate Service by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. (Patterson, Rebecca)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INTERIM SCHEDULING ORDER re #14 Joint Motion re briefing schedule. See PDF for details. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/3/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION Briefing Schedule Unopposed by Jason Matyascik.(Rose, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re Minute Order Vacated. In light of the filing of the motion to dismiss the court's minute order of 5/9/19, is vacated. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. re #11 Certificate of Service (Patterson, Rebecca)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Service List, #4 Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Patterson, Rebecca)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Marie Carroll re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Health care delivery for Alaska Natives, #2 Exhibit 2 Alaska Tribal Health Compact, #3 Exhibit 3 ASNA Corporate Bylaws, #4 Exhibit 4 ASNA Articles of Incorporation, #5 Exhibit 5 Physician Employment Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 Temporary Continuation of Coverage Notice Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 ASNA Funding Agreement)(Patterson, Rebecca)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] filed by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Barnes v Bristol, #2 Exhibit B Bekkum v. SSMH, #3 Exhibit C Beversdorf v. TCC)(Patterson, Rebecca)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd..(Patterson, Rebecca)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Ann Patterson on behalf of Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. (Patterson, Rebecca)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint)(Monkman, Richard)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. (Monkman, Richard)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Monkman, Richard)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. from SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF ALASKA SECOND JUDICIAL DISTRICT AT UTQIAGVIK, case number 2BA-19-86 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2697678) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Complaint)(Monkman, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matyascik v. Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.
Represented By: Richard D. Monkman
Represented By: Kendri M. M. Cesar
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Matyascik
Represented By: Michael A. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?