Hardy v. City of Nome et al
Plaintiff: Clarice Leota Hardy
Defendant: John Papasodora, City of Nome and Nicholas Harvey
Case Number: 2:2020cv00001
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Evans on behalf of John Papasodora (Evans, Joseph)
April 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura L. Farley on behalf of Nicholas Harvey (Farley, Laura)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Order at Docket 10 by Clarice Leota Hardy (Cesar, Kendri M.)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Clarice Leota Hardy. John Papasodora waiver sent on 3/5/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Cesar, Kendri M.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Clarice Leota Hardy. City of Nome waiver sent on 3/5/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Cesar, Kendri M.)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re proof of service or status report re service due by 3/20/2020. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Clarice Leota Hardy. Nicholas Harvey waiver sent on 3/5/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Cesar, Kendri M.)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/3/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen L. Pevar, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 Receipt of 150 non-resident attorney payment for Stephen Pevar as to Plaintiff Clarice Leota Hardy. re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Stephen L. Pevar (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Mark Joseph Carter. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2840799.) by Clarice Leota Hardy.(Carter, Mark)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Stephen L. Pevar by Clarice Leota Hardy. (Attachments: #1 Errata Certificate of Good Standing)(Pevar, Stephen)
February 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to City of Nome. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant City of Nome, (KMC, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to Nicholas Harvey, John Papasodora. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant John Papasodora, (KMC, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Nicolas Harvey, (KMC, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Koteff, Stephen)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Nome, Nicholas Harvey, John Papasodora (Filing fee $ 400/receipt # 097--2835791), filed by Clarice Leota Hardy.(Koteff, Stephen) Modified on 2/20/2020 to add receipt number from pay.gov (PXS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. City of Nome et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Papasodora
Represented By: Joseph W. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Nome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Harvey
Represented By: Laura L. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarice Leota Hardy
Represented By: Stephen Koteff
Represented By: Stephen Pevar
Represented By: Joshua A. Decker
Represented By: Mark J. Carter
Represented By: Kendri M. M. Cesar
Represented By: Stephen L. Pevar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?