Lewis v. Donley

Case Number: 3:2006cv00053
Filed: March 8, 2006
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2011 337 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 326 Motion for equitable remedies. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/8/11. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 22, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 130 Motion to Compel; denying 148 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/22/09. (GMM, COURT STAFF)
May 28, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 114 Motion for Leave to File; denying 118 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 123 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 126 Motion for Summary Judgment. Any remaining dispositive or discovery motions must be filed within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/28/09. (GMM, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2006 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion to Dismiss

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Donley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?