USA v. Gerlay
Case Number: 3:2009cr00085
Filed: November 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Office: Anchorage Office
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Order on Motion in Limine
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Final Report and Recommendation, Memorandum Opinion
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Initial Report and Recommendation, Memorandum Opinion, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Initial Report and Recommendation, Memorandum Opinion, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order on Motion to Strike
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Gerlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?