USA v. Jensen et al

Case Number: 3:2009cr00108
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2011 299 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
May 4, 2011 298 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion to Strike
April 5, 2011 280 Opinion or Order of the Court Order
February 14, 2011 267 Opinion or Order of the Court Order
December 3, 2010 259 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
June 10, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion to Dismiss
June 4, 2010 116 Opinion or Order of the Court Initial Report and Recommendation, Memorandum Opinion, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
February 16, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion to Dismiss
December 21, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Order

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Jensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?