Nukapigak et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al

Plaintiff: Jonah Nukapigak, Sam Kunaknana, Edward Nukapigak, Clarence Ahnupkana, Robert Nukapigak, Martha Itta and John Nicholls
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas P. Bostick and Christopher D. Lestochi
Case Number: 3:2013cv00044
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Gleason
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4332 Environmental Policy - Coop of Agency Repo
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2014 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 149 . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/12/2014. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 27, 2014 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re Motions for Summary Judgment. Within 21 days of the date of this order, the parties in this case shall file and serve, either jointly or separately, a motion(s) or stipulation that proposes the further proceedings that should occur in this matter.Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 05/27/2014. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 26, 2015 223 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER: re Motions for Summary Judgment: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 107 and Supplemental Briefing 214 ;ConocoPhillips' and the Corps' Cross Motions for Summary Judgment 127 and 131 . Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 05/26/2015. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nukapigak et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonah Nukapigak
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Kunaknana
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Nukapigak
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Ahnupkana
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nukapigak
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Itta
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nicholls
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. Bostick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. Lestochi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.