Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P. v. Alarm Protection Technology, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P.
Defendant: Alarm Protection Technology, LLC, Alarm Protection Technology Alaska, LLC and Alarm Protection Alaska, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00102
Filed: June 13, 2013
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Gleason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2017 532 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re Counterclaim Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 337 . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 02/07/2017. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
December 6, 2016 429 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re Motion for Spoliation Sanctions 236 . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/06/2016. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 1, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re Preliminary Injunction 53 . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 06/01/2015. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P. v. Alarm Protection Technology, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P.
Represented By: Alfred T. Clayton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alarm Protection Technology, LLC
Represented By: James E. Torgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alarm Protection Technology Alaska, LLC
Represented By: James E. Torgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alarm Protection Alaska, LLC
Represented By: James E. Torgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?