Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Parker Drilling Company

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Parker Drilling Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00181
Filed: September 18, 2013
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Gleason
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2015 404 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION & ORDER RE EQUITABLE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 05/29/2015. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 20, 2015 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT: RE 202 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. RE 204 Motion for Judicial Notice is GRANTED in Part and DENIED in part. (See order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/20/2015. (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 22, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re Parker Drilling's Motion to Compel EEOC's Production of Documents Bates Numbered EEOC 000001-000099 85 (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/22/2014. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Parker Drilling Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: May Rowen Che(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Carmen Flores(Designation Retained)
Represented By: William R. Tamayo(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Drilling Company
Represented By: Renea I. Saade(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?