Richey v. Matanuska-Susitna Borough

Plaintiff: Andrea Richey
Defendant: Matanuska-Susitna Borough
Case Number: 3:2014cv00170
Filed: September 3, 2014
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION: RE 53 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. (See order for details). Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 04/30/2015. (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER at 51 is amended as stated. See full PDF for details. (NKD, COURT STAFF)
April 14, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and OPINION denying 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/13/15. (NKD, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 21 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/7/15. (NKD, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 44 Motion to Strike. The motion at docket 44 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Factual issues related to the immunity defense and the exhaustion of remedies defense will be tried by a jury. All other issues will be tried by the court. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/20/15. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richey v. Matanuska-Susitna Borough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Richey
Represented By: Ronald A. Offret(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matanuska-Susitna Borough
Represented By: Thomas M. Daniel(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Sarah Jane Shine(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?