Ninilchik Traditional Council v. Towarak et al

Plaintiff: Ninilchik Traditional Council
Defendant: Tim Towarak, Sally Jewell and Tom Vilsack
Case Number: 3:2015cv00205
Filed: October 22, 2015
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 51 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/22/16. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 17, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows: Defendants' motion to dismiss NTC's claim that the Board violated 50 C.F.R. § 100.10(d)(6) by not establishing frameworks to guide the delegation of its authority is DENIED; Defendants' motion to dismiss NTC's claim that the in-season manager's failure to decide its Kenai gillnet permit application based on the merits of the operational plan violates 50 C.F.R. § 100.27(e)(10)(iv)(J) is DENIED; in all other respects, Defendants' motion is GRANTED.. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/17/16. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 8, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for judicial notice. NTC's request for the court to take judicial notice of Ninilchik Traditional Council v. United States, 152 F.3d 928 tbl. (9th Cir. 1998) is DENIED; in all other respects NTC's motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/8/16. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 18, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Judicial Notice. See PDF document. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/18/16. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ninilchik Traditional Council v. Towarak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ninilchik Traditional Council
Represented By: Anna Chapman Crary(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John Martin Starkey(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Towarak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?