Keating v. Nordstrom, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maureen Keating
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00030
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Gleason
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER denying 213 Motion for Sanctions for Discovery Abuse. Pursuant to the Court's order at docket 225, any renewed motion for partial summary judgment shall be filed within 21 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/3/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (JLH, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR COURT TO DETERMINE THE SUFFICIENCY OF RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE OR IMPOSE OTHER DISCOVERY SANCTIONS: Plaintiffs Motion for the Court to Determi ne the Sufficiency of Responses and Objections to Requests for Admission and Motion to Compel Further Response or Impose Other Discovery Sanctions at Docket 193 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth above. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/23/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: re Motion to Dismiss and Other Pending Motions (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 01/26/2018. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keating v. Nordstrom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Keating
Represented By: Jason E. Skala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?