Webb v. Furie Operating Alaska, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bruce D. Webb
Defendant: Cornucopia Oil and Gas Company, LLC and Furie Operating Alaska, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00150
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2018 Filing 12 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report by 9/24/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 8/1/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR INDEFINITE EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Cornucopia Oil and Gas Company, LLC, Furie Operating Alaska, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torgerson, James)
July 26, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cornucopia Oil and Gas Company, LLC, Furie Operating Alaska, LLC. (Torgerson, James)
July 20, 2018 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Summons Issued to Furie Operating and Cornucopia Oil and Gas Acknowledgement filed by Bruce D. Webb. (Clarkson, Kevin)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: proof of service or status report due within 7 days.(RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of procedures to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 7/3/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 28, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT /FIRST against Cornucopia Oil and Gas Company, LLC, Furie Operating Alaska, LLC, filed by Bruce D. Webb.(Clarkson, Kevin)
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Furie Operating Alaska, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Cornucopia Oil and Gas Company, LLC)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bruce D. Webb. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cornucopia Oil and Gas Company, LLC, Furie Operating Alaska, LLC (Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC014615, filed by Bruce D. Webb.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to Cornucopia Oil and Gas Company, LLC, Furie Operating Alaska, LLC. (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Furie Operating Alaska, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornucopia Oil and Gas Company, LLC
Represented By: James E. Torgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furie Operating Alaska, LLC
Represented By: James E. Torgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce D. Webb
Represented By: Jake W. Staser
Represented By: Kevin G. Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?