Denman v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Todd Denman
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00177
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Denman. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Whitehead, Marc)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Proof of service has not been filed as to defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. Proof of service to be filed or response to this notice of deficiency as to why service has not been effected pursuant to Rule 4(m), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, is due on or before 10/10/18 or the complaint as to defendant Life Insurance Company of North America may be dismissed. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice at docket #3 , and supported by Certificate of Good Standing at docket #7 by Marc S. Whitehead is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice at docket #7 is incomplete and not signed and is denied as moot. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Marc S. Whitehead by Todd Denman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit cert of good standing)(Whitehead, Marc)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 TMB TEXT ORDER re #3 Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Marc S. Whitehead. Counsel shall comply with the requirement under D.Ak. L.R. 83.1(d)(4)[B](i) within seven (7) days of this order. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 8/15/18. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2018 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Marc S. Whitehead. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2557283.) by Todd Denman.(Whitehead, Marc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Whitehead, Marc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2557240.), filed by Todd Denman.(Whitehead, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denman v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Denman
Represented By: Marc Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?