O'Hara Corporation v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: O'Hara Corporation
Defendant: George Lopez and Adak Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00194
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chad A. Cloutier, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (BJK, COURT STAFF)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of procedures to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/11/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 4, 2018 Summons Issued as to Adak Logistics, LLC, George Lopez. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant George Lopez, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant ADAK Logistics, LLC)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Chad A. Cloutier (Bar No. 009167). ($150/Receipt #097--2571314) by O'Hara Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Reichlin, Jerald) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add payment information(PXS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Reichlin, Jerald)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2571294.), filed by O'Hara Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Reichlin, Jerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Hara Corporation v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Hara Corporation
Represented By: Jerald M. Reichlin
Represented By: Chad Allen Cloutier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adak Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?