Chappell v. Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.

Plaintiff: Christopher Mark Chappell
Defendant: Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00201
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: Alaska District Court
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lars J. Nelson on behalf of Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin. (Nelson, Lars)
September 30, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Mark Chappell. Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin. served on 9/20/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Eaglin, Paul)
September 28, 2018 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #7 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 28, 2018 7 Featured Case SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due 60 days after the Defendant's initial appearance. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 9/28/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 27, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin. (Pomeroy, Richard)
September 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin., U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Application to Waive Filing Fee, at docket #3 , is granted. Service of Process is to be completed within 90 days of the date the Complaint was filed. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 9/10/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 7, 2018 4 Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Commissioner)(PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/10/2018 to reflect date filed (PXS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Mark Chappell.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 7, 2018 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin., filed by Christopher Mark Chappell.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chappell v. Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.
Represented By: Lars J. Nelson
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mark Chappell
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?