Smith v. Cox et al

Plaintiff: Billy Dean Smith, Josh Vars, Frostad Phoenix, Richard Dorsey, David Paul Nelson, Upgrade David, Kevin A. Slats, Jr., Zayquan Woodruff, James McGee, Hoover Adams, Daniel Lee Hinsberger, John R. Douglas, James R. Rookard, Jr., Kenneth Dion, Cody Akers, Michael A. Powell, Frank Nunooruk and William D. Moondog
Defendant: John Cox and William Lapinskas
Case Number: 3:2018cv00216
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION by Billy Dean Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to remove myself from case re #1 Complaint by Upgrade David. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(BJK, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Join and Recruit and Sown Joint Declaration by Billy Dean Smith, Hoover Adams, James McGee, Frank Nunooruk, James R. Rookard, Jr, Josh Vars, Michael A. Powell, William D. Moondog, Frostad Phoenix, Richard Dorsey, John R. Douglas, Zayquan Woodruff, Cody Akers, Kevin A. Slats, Jr, Upgrade David.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 SWORN DECLARATION w/evidence re #1 Complaint by Billy Dean Smith. (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION (unsigned) re #1 Complaint by Billy Dean Smith. (Attachments: #1 corrected page 2, #2 signature page)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Smith re #3 Financial Affidavit - CJA 23, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Billy Dean Smith. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 EMERGENCY Writ for Federal Assistance and, Sworn Joint Declaration by Kenneth Dion, Daniel Lee Hinsberger, David Paul Nelson, Billy Dean Smith.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Recruit ACLU of Alaska & Plaintiff's Motion to Join, and Sworn Declaration by Plaintiff by Daniel Lee Hinsberger.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Joinder, and Motion for this Court to Recruit Pro Bono Attorney and Recruit ACLU of Alaska, & Sworn Declaration by Kenneth Dion.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Joinder and/or Consolidate, and, Motion to Recruit Pro Bono, and Sworn Declaration by David Paul Nelson.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Billy Dean Smith. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Billy Dean Smith.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Cox, William Lapinskas, filed by Billy Dean Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lapinskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Dean Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Vars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frostad Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Paul Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Upgrade David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin A. Slats, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zayquan Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoover Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Hinsberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Rookard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Nunooruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D. Moondog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?