Larsen v. Commissioner, Soc. Sec. Admin.
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn G. Larsen
Defendant: Commissioner, Soc. Sec. Admin.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00221
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Groebner on behalf of Commissioner, Soc. Sec. Admin. (Groebner, Benjamin)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gwendolyn G. Larsen. (Eaglin, Paul)
October 13, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gwendolyn G. Larsen., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gwendolyn G. Larsen. (Eaglin, Paul)
October 12, 2018 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #7 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency Record due w/in 60 days. Opening brief due w/in 30 days; response due w/in 30 days; reply due w/in 14 days. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/12/2018. (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gwendolyn G. Larsen. Commissioner, Soc. Sec. Admin. served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement summons served US Atty)(Eaglin, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Commissioner, Soc. Sec. Admin. (Pomeroy, Richard)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Service of Process to be completed w/in 90 days. Def to file Answer/Response w/in 60 days. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 09/28/2018. (CME, COURT STAFF)
September 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Soc. Sec. Admin., U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Commissioner, Soc. Sec. Admin., (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Eaglin, Paul)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Soc. Sec. Admin. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2585455.), filed by Gwendolyn G. Larsen.(Eaglin, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larsen v. Commissioner, Soc. Sec. Admin.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Soc. Sec. Admin.
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Represented By: Benjamin J. Groebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn G. Larsen
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?