Mattice v. Northrim Bank

Plaintiff: Richard Mattice
Defendant: Northrim Bank
Case Number: 3:2018cv00234
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 03:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. Trial by Jury set for 1/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. Exhibit List due by 1/6/2020. Final Witness List due by 1/6/2020. Trial Briefs and Voir Dire due 01/13/2020, Jury Instructions 01/06/2020. Motions in Limine 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 09/26/2018. (See Order for details). cc: Jury Clerk.(CME, COURT STAFF)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery closes by 8/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2019. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 11/15/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dudukgian, Goriune)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 SLG TEXT ORDER: At Docket #7 , the parties were ordered to file their Rule 26 Meeting Report by October 31, 2018. To date, the report has not been filed. Counsel for plaintiff shall file the report by Tuesday, November 13, 2018 or an order to show cause shall be issued.(CME, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance with Order Subsequent to Removal by Northrim Bank re #3 Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal (Callahan, Patrick)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING AND PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/12/2018. (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Northrim Bank (Callahan, Patrick)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northrim Bank. (Callahan, Patrick)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Northrim Bank.(Fisher, Gregory)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Northrim Bank from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, Third Judicial District, case number 3AN-18-8761CI. ( Filing fee $ 400-Receipt #ANC014951) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mattice v. Northrim Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mattice
Represented By: Goriune Dudukgian
Represented By: James J. Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrim Bank
Represented By: Patrick Charles Callahan
Represented By: Gregory S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?