Alsco Inc. v. Benihana, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alsco Inc.
Defendant: Benihana, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00236
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Dismissal by Alsco Inc. (Jungreis, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report by 12/21/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Andrew Scully on behalf of Benihana, Inc. (Scully, Peter)
November 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Singer on behalf of Benihana, Inc. (Singer, Matthew)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alsco Inc.. (Jungreis, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Order re Motion to Dismiss by Alsco Inc. re #5 Order (Jungreis, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of procedures to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 10/16/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Benihana, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to Benihana, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alsco Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Benihana, Inc. (Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC014968.), filed by Alsco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alsco Inc. v. Benihana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benihana, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Peter Andrew Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alsco Inc.
Represented By: Michael Jungreis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?