Gutierrez v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Vickie Gutierrez
Defendant: Dena A. Coy, South Central Foundation Treatment Program and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00237
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Alaska District Court
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER & WARNING NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF RE MOTION TO DISMISS: See attached Order for important information re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 11/29/2018. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
November 29, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER RE MOTIONS AND PROCEEDING IN FEDERAL COURT signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 11/29/2018. On or before 12/26/2018, Ms. Gutierrez must respond to Docket #8 Motion to Substitute Party and Docket #9 Motion to Dismiss, or waive any objection to those motions. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of the District Courts Handbook, Representing Yourself in Alaskas Federal Court, to Plaintiff with this Order. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
October 29, 2018 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pomeroy, Richard)
October 29, 2018 8 MOTION to Substitute Party by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pomeroy, Richard)
October 17, 2018 7 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by United States of America (Pomeroy, Richard)
October 17, 2018 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Opp to MOT for Default, #2 Exhibit 2 DFDT's MOT for EOT to Respond to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 PROP Order Denying PLTF MOT, #4 Exhibit 4 Order Granting DFDT's MOT for EOT, #5 Exhibit 5 Order for Judgment, #6 Exhibit 6 Order MOT for Default, #7 Exhibit 7 Affadavit and Memo, #8 Exhibit 8 Motion for Default, #9 Exhibit 9 Summons and Notice of Judicial Asgmt, #10 Exhibit 10 Entry of Appearance, #11 Exhibit 11 Complaint for Libel Defamation)(Pomeroy, Richard)
October 17, 2018 5 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by United States of America (Pomeroy, Richard)
October 10, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2018 3 CERTIFICATION by U.S. Attorney Alaska re #1 Notice of Removal (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2018 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, case number 3AN-18-06346 CI., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 State Summons, #2 State Complaint)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dena A. Coy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Central Foundation Treatment Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?