Jenkins v. Clear Recon Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly Jenkins
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp. and Guild Mortgage Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00240
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support re #10 First MOTION to Remand filed by Kimberly Jenkins. (Feronti, Nicholas)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 First MOTION to Remand filed by Guild Mortgage Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sandone, Megan)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Kimberly Jenkins re #10 First MOTION to Remand by Kimberly Jenkins. (Feronti, Nicholas)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 First MOTION to Remand by Kimberly Jenkins.(Feronti, Nicholas)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Guild Mortgage Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sandone, Megan)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clear Recon Corp.. (Stoddard, Lewis)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Clear Recon Corp.. (Stoddard, Lewis)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guild Mortgage Company. (Sandone, Megan)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Guild Mortgage Company.(Sandone, Megan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Guild Mortgage Company (Sandone, Megan)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Sandone, Megan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Guild Mortgage Company from Superior Court for State of Alaska Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-18-09347CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2593670), filed by Guild Mortgage Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sandone, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Clear Recon Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp.
Represented By: Lewis Nishioka Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guild Mortgage Company
Represented By: Megan N. Sandone
Represented By: William M. Wuestenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jenkins
Represented By: Nicholas Feronti
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Feronti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?