International Insurance Company of Hannover SE v. Alaska Industrial, LLC et al
Plaintiff: International Insurance Company of Hannover SE
Defendant: Alaska Industrial, LLC and Alaska Industrial Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00242
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 26 TMB TEXT ORDER: In light of #25 Joint Status Report filed by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall either file a dismissal of this action or an updated joint status report on or before 12/28/2018. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
November 21, 2018 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE. (Ray, Herbert)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TMB ORDER DENYING without prejudice #5 Motion for Prejudgment Writ of Attachment, Imposition of Constructive Trust or Preliminary Injunction. The hearing set for 10/23/2018 at 2:00 PM is VACATED. Please see attached Minute Order signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 10/22/2018. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
October 22, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic On Shortened Time - Hearing is tomorrow at 2:00 pm in anchorage PLAINTIFF'S NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY filed by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ray, Herbert)
October 22, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic On Shortened Time - Hearing is tomorrow at 2:00 pm in anchorage by Alaska Industrial, LLC.(Weiner, Jason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, IMPOSITION OF CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Alaska Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Weiner, Jason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, IMPOSITION OF CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Alaska Industrial, LLC. (Weiner, Jason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S OCTOBER 18, 2018 ORDER by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE re #18 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ray, Herbert)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TMB ORDER: In light of the Notice at #15 , please see attached Minute Order signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 10/18/2018. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
October 18, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Complaint Motion for Prejudgment Writ of Attachment Motion for Expedited Consideration served on Deborah Day for Alaska Industrial Trucking< LLC on 10/17/2018, filed by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE. (Ray, Herbert)
October 18, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Complaint Motion for Prejudgment Writ of Attachment Motion for Expedited Consideration served on Jeffrey Day for Alaska Industrial, LLc on 10/17/2018, filed by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE. (Ray, Herbert)
October 18, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COURT RE SERVICE OF MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT ON DEFENDANTS by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE re #14 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ray, Herbert)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER MODIFYING #13 Order re Motion to Expedite and vacating hearing set for 10/19/2018 at 2:00 PM. Please see attached Order signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on October 17, 2018. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Expedite. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion at #5 is SET FOR HEARING on 10/19/2018 at 2:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Defendants are directed to file a Response before 2:00 PM on 10/18/2018 as set forth in the attached Minute Order. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 10/17/2018. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF).
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE: Based upon random reassignment, this action is reassigned to the Honorable Timothy M. Burgess for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:18-cv-00242-TMB. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The assigned district judge hereby recuses himself from presiding in this case and requests the clerk of court to randomly reassign this case to another judge. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Thomas Berne on behalf of International Insurance Company of Hannover SE (Berne, Zachary)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of HERBERT H. RAY, JR. re #8 MOTION to Expedite MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, IMPOSITION OF CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST, OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Ray, Herbert)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, IMPOSITION OF CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST, OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ray, Herbert)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of ANDREW SPENCER re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, IMPOSITION OF CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ray, Herbert)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 DECLARATION of HERBERT H. RAY, JR. re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, IMPOSITION OF CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Ray, Herbert)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, IMPOSITION OF CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Ray, Herbert)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Alaska Industrial,LLC c/o Jeffrey Day, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Alaska Industrial Trucking LLC c/o Deborah Day)(BJK, COURT STAFF)
October 15, 2018 Summons Issued as to Alaska Industrial Trucking, LLC c/o Jeffrey Day and Alaska Industrial, LLC c/o Deborah Day. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Alaska Industrial, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Alaska Industrial Trucking, LLC)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alaska Industrial Trucking, LLC, Alaska Industrial, LLC (Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC014991.), filed by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 12, 2018 Summons Issued as to Alaska Industrial Trucking, LLC, Alaska Industrial, LLC. (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Insurance Company of Hannover SE v. Alaska Industrial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Insurance Company of Hannover SE
Represented By: Herbert H. Ray, Jr.
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Berne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Industrial, LLC
Represented By: Jason A. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Industrial Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?