Calista Corporation v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: Calista Corporation
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2018cv00246
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 23, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.(Pomeroy, Richard)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney for District of Alaska, and U.S. Attorney General on 10/23/2018, filed by Calista Corporation. (Foster, Laura)
October 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(BJK, COURT STAFF)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Calista Corporation re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #1 Complaint. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Calista Corporation. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $ 400-Receipt #ANC001508), filed by Calista Corporation.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calista Corporation v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calista Corporation
Represented By: Christine Victoria Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?