Jones v. More et al

Plaintiff: Darin Lee Jones
Defendant: LT Mebane, LT More, CO McCullough and Inmate Grundy
Case Number: 3:2018cv00249
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Darin Lee Jones. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION Order For All Pictures And Video Of Time Of Attack And Pic's From The Investigator by Darin Lee Jones.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE 6 Month Account Balance Inmate by Darin Lee Jones (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 Rule 35 Physical and Mental Health Examinations by Darin Lee Jones (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Darin Lee Jones.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Darin Lee Jones. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner's Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Darin Lee Jones.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 Prisoner's COMPLAINT Under the Civil Rights Act 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Grundy, CO McCullough, Mebane, LT More, filed by Darin Lee Jones.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. More et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT Mebane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT More
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmate Grundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Lee Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?