Laureta v. Food Services of America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ramil Laureta
Defendant: Food Services of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00276
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2019. Discovery due by 10/15/2019. Motions due by 12/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2019. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 01/11/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Johnson, Douglas)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/18/2018. (CME, COURT STAFF)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Food Services of America, Inc.. (Ducey, Cynthia)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Food Services of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ducey, Cynthia)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Food Services of America, Inc.. (Ducey, Cynthia)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Food Services of America, Inc.. (Ducey, Cynthia)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia L. Ducey on behalf of Food Services of America, Inc. (Ducey, Cynthia)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Food Services of America, Inc. (Ducey, Cynthia)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ramil Laureta, Food Services of America, Inc. from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-18-10278 CI. ( Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC015155), filed by Ramil Laureta, Food Services of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laureta v. Food Services of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramil Laureta
Represented By: Douglas G. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Services of America, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia L. Ducey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?