New Horizon Telecom, Inc. v. Everest Indemnity Insurance Company

Plaintiff: New Horizon Telecom, Inc.
Defendant: Everest Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00297
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due 4/30/2019; Discovery due 1/15/2020; Joinder of Parties due 4/30/2019; Discovery Motions due 3/6/2020; Dispositive Motions due 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 2/8/19. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zahare, A.)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 01/17/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company.(Zahare, A.)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Zahare, A.)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company (Zahare, A.)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. (Zahare, A.)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Zahare, A.)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company from Anchorage Superior Court, case number 3AN-18-10544CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2624826), filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zahare, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Horizon Telecom, Inc. v. Everest Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Horizon Telecom, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Michael Zahare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?