First Student, Inc. v. Teamsters, Local 959

Plaintiff: First Student, Inc.
Defendant: Teamsters, Local 959
Case Number: 3:2018cv00305
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:151
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 2/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) Report Form). (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Teamsters, Local 959.(Bridges, Raymond)
February 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Teamsters, Local 959. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismiss)(Bridges, Raymond)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 SLG TEXT ORDER re #11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Answer to Complaint, filed by Teamsters, Local 959, is GRANTED and the Answer is accepted as filed. Parties are notified that combined documents are not allowed. Attorney to re-file the portion "Motion to Dismiss" and "Memorandum" as soon as possible. (CME, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION to Answer by Teamsters, Local 959.(Bridges, Raymond) Modified on 2/19/2019 to clarify text (CME, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Answer to Complaint, by Teamsters, Local 959. (Attachments: #1 PROP ORDER Late Filing)(Bridges, Raymond)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Teamsters, Local 959. (Attachments: #1 Mot to Dismiss, #2 Memo Supp Mot to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order Mot to Dis, #4 Kuklis Ex A, #5 Kuklis Ex B (Part 1), #6 Kuklis Ex C, #7 Kuklis Ex B (Part 2), #8 Kuklis Ex D, #9 Kuklis Ex E)(Bridges, Raymond)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 SLG TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion. Respondent's response to the Motion to Vacate at Docket #3 is now due February 18, 2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Party Counsel by Teamsters, Local 959. (Attachments: #1 Errata Notice of Appearance, #2 Supplement Declaration of Counsel, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Mot Ext)(Bridges, Raymond)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Student, Inc.. (Saade, Renea)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition, Motion, Memo in Support of Petition & Motion to Vacate served on Raymond Scott Bridges on December 28, 2018, filed by First Student, Inc.. (Saade, Renea)
December 27, 2018 Summons Issued as to First Student, Inc.. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant First Student, Inc., (BJK, COURT STAFF)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law by First Student, Inc. #3 MOTION to Vacate filed by First Student, Inc.. (Saade, Renea)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Vacate by First Student, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saade, Renea)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Saade, Renea)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Vacate Award against First Student, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2627841.), filed by First Student, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Saade, Renea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Student, Inc. v. Teamsters, Local 959
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Student, Inc.
Represented By: Renea I. Saade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters, Local 959
Represented By: Raymond Scott Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?