Garness Engineering Group, Ltd. v. Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc.
Plaintiff: Garness Engineering Group, Ltd.
Defendant: Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00041
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/26/19. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Stipulated by Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jorgensen, Caryn)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order.. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/04/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2019: #1 Form) (CME, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc..(Jorgensen, Caryn)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc. answer due 3/4/2019. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 2/19/19. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint UNOPPOSED by Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jorgensen, Caryn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Jorgensen, Caryn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc. (Jorgensen, Caryn)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc.. (Jorgensen, Caryn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Calvin Rosen re #1 Notice of Removal by Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc.. (Jorgensen, Caryn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Jorgensen, Caryn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2649390), filed by Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Jorgensen, Caryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garness Engineering Group, Ltd. v. Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garness Engineering Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Brent R. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyocera Document Solutions Northwest, Inc.
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?