Hunley v. Sourdough Transfer, Inc.

Plaintiff: Carla Hunley
Defendant: Sourdough Transfer, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00050
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support by Sourdough Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Proposed Order)(Rothstein, Robert)
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sourdough Transfer, Inc., filed by Carla Hunley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Nyquist, Kara)
April 16, 2019 Docket Annotation Immediate Action Needed: Your recent electronic filing with the District of Alaska is in error: Wrong Event Selected re: #16 Amended Document filed by Carla Hunley. ACTION NEEDED: Attorney to refile the document using the event Amended Complaint (RMC, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Carla Hunley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Nyquist, Kara)
April 9, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Carla Hunley. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Nyquist, Kara)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 4/3/2019. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiff's Response to #8 Motion to Dismiss is due on or before 4/9/2019. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Memorandum, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Carla Hunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nyquist, Kara)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change/Correction of Email Address by Carla Hunley (Nyquist, Kara)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sourdough Transfer, Inc.. (Rothstein, Robert)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Defendant-Petitioner's Schedule of State Court Filings by Sourdough Transfer, Inc. re #4 Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B)(Rothstein, Robert)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM In Support by Sourdough Transfer, Inc. #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sourdough Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B)(Rothstein, Robert)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sourdough Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothstein, Robert)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Defendant's Service List by Sourdough Transfer, Inc. (Rothstein, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM In Support by Sourdough Transfer, Inc. #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Robert G. Rothstein. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2656006.) filed by Sourdough Transfer, Inc.. (Rothstein, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Robert G. Rothstein. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2656006.) by Sourdough Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothstein, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal, Filed with The District Court for the State of Alaska at Anchorage (Case No. 3AN-19-5006CI) by Robert Glenn Rothstein on behalf of Sourdough Transfer, Inc. (Rothstein, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Rothstein, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sourdough Transfer, Inc. from District Court for the State of Alaska, Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-19-5006CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2655563), filed by Sourdough Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A-Complaint)(Rothstein, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunley v. Sourdough Transfer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sourdough Transfer, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Glenn Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Hunley
Represented By: Kara Arlene Nyquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?