Manogiamanu v. United States of America
Petitioner: Maataua K. Manogiamanu
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00051
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/17/19. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel by Maataua K. Manogiamanu.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/5/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; denying #3 Motion for Hearing; denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/5/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Maataua K. Manogiamanu.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Detention Hearing by Maataua K. Manogiamanu.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCREENING ORDER: The Petition #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. New 2241 or 2254 petition due within 14 days. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 2/28/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), filed by Maataua K. Manogiamanu.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manogiamanu v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maataua K. Manogiamanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?