Northern Alaska Environmental Center et al v. United States Department of the Interior et al

Plaintiff: Alaska Wilderness League, The Wilderness Society, The Sierra Club, Defenders of Wildlife and Northern Alaska Environmental Center
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, David Bernhardt, Brian Steed and United States Department of the Interior
Intervenor Defendant: ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00055
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Intervene. ConocoPhillips is admitted into this litigation as an intervenor-defendant. ConocoPhillips is directed to file its Answer within 14 days of when the stay ordered in this case (Dkt. 12) is lifted. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 4/10/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.. (Steen, Ryan)
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Ryan P. Steen re #17 MOTION to Intervene Unopposed, #18 Memorandum by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.. (Steen, Ryan)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of John F. Schell, Jr. re #17 MOTION to Intervene Unopposed, #18 Memorandum by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CPAI Comment Letter)(Steen, Ryan)
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM In Support of Intervention by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc. #17 MOTION to Intervene Unopposed filed by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.. (Steen, Ryan)
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Intervene Unopposed by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Proposed Order)(Steen, Ryan)
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, The Sierra Club, Alaska Wilderness League. Brian Steed served on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Bostrom, Suzanne)
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, The Sierra Club, Alaska Wilderness League. United States Department of the Interior served on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Bostrom, Suzanne)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, The Sierra Club, Alaska Wilderness League. Bureau of Land Management served on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Bostrom, Suzanne)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, The Sierra Club, Alaska Wilderness League. David Bernhardt served on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Bostrom, Suzanne)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 4/2/19. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, The Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bostrom, Suzanne)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Wilderness Society. (Bostrom, Suzanne)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Sierra Club. (Bostrom, Suzanne)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northern Alaska Environmental Center. (Bostrom, Suzanne)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defenders of Wildlife. (Bostrom, Suzanne)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Wilderness League. (Bostrom, Suzanne)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Cases by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, The Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society (Bostrom, Suzanne)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of related case with 3:18-cv-00030-SLG and 3:18-cv-00031-SLG (CME, COURT STAFF)
March 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, Brian Steed, United States Department of the Interior.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant United States Department of the Interior, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Bureau of Land Management, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant David Bernhardt, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Brian Steed)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Bostrom, Suzanne)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2658125.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Bostrom, Suzanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Alaska Environmental Center et al v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Wilderness League
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Valerie L. Brown
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Valerie L. Brown
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Sierra Club
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Valerie L. Brown
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Alaska Environmental Center
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Valerie L. Brown
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan P. Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?