Falleur v. Wood
Plaintiff: Michael Falleur
Defendant: Anthony Wood
Case Number: 3:2019cv00079
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Unavailability by Anthony Wood (Wilkson, Jimmie)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/18/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Brickenstein, Eric)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 SLG TEXT ORDER: The parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer at Docket #13 is GRANTED. Defendant's answer at Docket #14 is accepted as timely filed. (CME, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Anthony Wood. (Wilkson, Jimmie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Anthony Wood.(Wilkson, Jimmie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION For Extension of Time To File Answer by Anthony Wood.(Wilkson, Jimmie)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 05/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Form)(CME, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmie C. Wilkson on behalf of Anthony Wood (Wilkson, Jimmie)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Defendant on May 1, 2019, filed by Michael Falleur. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Trueb, Lanning)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric J. Brickenstein, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Haglund, at docket #7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Michael E. Haglund by Michael Falleur.(Haglund, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Eric J. Brickenstein. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2675858.) by Michael Falleur.(Brickenstein, Eric)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Michael E. Haglund re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Michael E. Haglund. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2675815.) by Michael Falleur. (Haglund, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Michael E. Haglund. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2675815.) by Michael Falleur.(Haglund, Michael)
March 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Anthony Wood. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Anthony Wood. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Trueb, Lanning)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Negligence against Anthony Wood (Filing fee $ 400/Receipt #097--2670293), filed by Michael Falleur.(Trueb, Lanning) Modified on 3/25/2019 to reflect receipt number(PXS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falleur v. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Falleur
Represented By: Lanning M. Trueb
Represented By: Eric Joshua Brickenstein
Represented By: Michael Erick Haglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Wood
Represented By: Jimmie C. Wilkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?