Currin v. Deery et al
Plaintiff: Ben T. Currin
Defendant: Hugh G. Deery, III, James C. Bryant and Nicholas M. Morelli
Case Number: 3:2019cv00095
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2019. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/16/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/17/2020. See PDF for all other deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/17/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 Witness List by Hugh G. Deery, III. (Rankin, Christina)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Barber, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Pleadings by James C. Bryant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit EOA, #5 Exhibit Jury Demand, #6 Exhibit Answer, #7 Exhibit NOA, #8 Exhibit Jury Demand, #9 Exhibit Answer, #10 Exhibit Initial Pretrial Order, #11 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Graves, Cheryl)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Barber on behalf of Ben T. Currin (Barber, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/16/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James C. Bryant (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PLEADINGS by James C. Bryant (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PARTIES by James C. Bryant (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James C. Bryant from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, Third Judicial District, case number 3AN-18-11077 CI. ( Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC015611), filed by James C. Bryant. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Notice of Removal)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Currin v. Deery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh G. Deery, III
Represented By: Christina A. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Bryant
Represented By: Cheryl L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas M. Morelli
Represented By: Rebecca A. Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben T. Currin
Represented By: Theodore D. Hoppner
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?