LaPointe v. Red Door Charters, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Adam LaPointe
Defendant: Robert K. Bornt, Red Door Charters, LLC, Kachemak Corp. and Trim, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00100
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Defendants by Adam LaPointe.(Vujasinovic, Vuk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vujasinovic, Vuk)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trim, LLC. (Waller, Thomas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Red Door Charters, LLC. (Waller, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vujasinovic, Vuk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 TMB TEXT ORDER: In light of the #13 Notice of voluntary dismissal defendant Kachemak Corp. is HEREBY dismissed without prejudice from this action. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Kachemak Corp. (Attachments: #1 1 Bill of Sale)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Voluntary DismissalKachemak Corp. by Adam LaPointe.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) Modified on 6/17/2019 to correct event.(RMC, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Kachemak Corp. answer due 7/1/2019. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to Trim, LLC. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Robert K. Bornt, Red Door Charters, LLC, Trim, LLC.(Waller, Thomas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Waller on behalf of Robert K. Bornt, Red Door Charters, LLC, Trim, LLC (Waller, Thomas)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by Kachemak Corp.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Trim, LLC, filed by Adam LaPointe. (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Trim, LLC)(Vujasinovic, Vuk)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vuk S. Vujasinovic, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Vuk Vujasinovic re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Vuk Vujasinovic. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2687282.) by Adam LaPointe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Poulson, Jack)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Vuk Vujasinovic. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2687282.) by Adam LaPointe.(Poulson, Jack)
April 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Robert K. Bornt, Kachemak Corp., Red Door Charters, LLC. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Red Door Charters, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Kachemak Corp., #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Robert K. Bornt)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Poulson, Jack)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2682092.), filed by Adam LaPointe.(Poulson, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaPointe v. Red Door Charters, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Bornt
Represented By: Thomas G. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Door Charters, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kachemak Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trim, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam LaPointe
Represented By: Jack G. Poulson
Represented By: Vuk S. Vujasinovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?